Chancellor Jim Meznek hired the following professional experts:
Jay R. Anderson, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Jay R. Anderson, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2006 – June 30, 2007
Steve Barton, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Jeff Donabedian, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Robert Dunivin, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Daniel Gildea, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2006 – June 30, 2007
Joseph Herrick, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1,2006 – June 30, 2007
Mike Ketaily, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Mike Ketaily, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2006 – June 30, 2007
Claudia Konieczny, Community Education Trainer, Ventura, College Effective April 10, 2006 – June 30, 2006
David Kromka, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Jerry Lara, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Mark Seastrom, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Gary Smith, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Jeff Stauffer, Community Education Trainer, Ventura College Effective April 13, 2006 – June 30, 2006
Danny Swenson, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2006 – June 30, 2007
Lisa Tarkany, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Mark Todd, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College Effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006